Scholl, Matthew Louis (CPSO#: 64997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-4293
Fax: (519) 258-8718
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew L. Scholl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Scholl ( CPSO# 64997 )

Business Address:
2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 200
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-4293

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW LOUIS SCHOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOLL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993