Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Schramm, David Ronald (CPSO#: 52880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 121
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13631
Fax: (613) 761-4356
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Schramm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schramm ( CPSO# 52880 )

Business Address:
Suite 121
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RONALD SCHRAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRAMM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1984