Schriber, Jeffrey Rodney (CPSO#: 56870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Transplant Institute
Virginia G. Piper Cancer Center
Suite 200
10460 North 92nd Street
Scottsdale AZ  85258
United States
Phone: (480) 323-1573
Fax: (480) 323-1375

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JEFFREY RODNEY SCHRIBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRIBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1988