Schroder, Corinne Dorothy (CPSO#: 33219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINNE DOROTHY SCHRODER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRODER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1982