Schroeder, George (CPSO#: 53350)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Names: Schroeder, George Rengen (used until: 14 Sep 1998 )     Virapen, George Rengen (used until: 13 Sep 1998 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007