Schubert, Peter John (CPSO#: 68409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: (807) 684-5868
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Schubert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schubert ( CPSO# 68409 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN SCHUBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996