Schuh, Andre Claudius (CPSO#: 52599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG 6-425
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6518
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Claudius Schuh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schuh ( CPSO# 52599 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Unit 5-208
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 795-4451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE CLAUDIUS SCHUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1985