Schulman, Sam (CPSO#: 43196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 10 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Swedish

Education:Karolinska Medico-Kirurgiska Institute, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thrombosis Service
HHS - General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44479
Fax: (905) 521-1551
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Schulman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Schulman ( CPSO# 43196 )

Business Address:
Thrombosis Service
HHS - General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 612
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
Sweden

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 01 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAM SCHULMAN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF HAEMATOLOGY & THROMBOEMBOLISM, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SCHULMAN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SCHULMAN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SCHULMAN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SCHULMAN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SCHULMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004