Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Schulz, Helen Ann (CPSO#: 56871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 1996