Schulz, Jan Ivan (CPSO#: 23956)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, German, Russian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Mar 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004