Schulz, Jane Ann (CPSO#: 69785)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1996 to 30 Apr 1996
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2001