Schuman, John Edward Joseph (CPSO#: 23656)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2010