Schuman, Miles Bennett (CPSO#: 71886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.0. Box 9
Chesterfield Inlet NU  X0C 0B0
Phone: (867) 898-9968

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nunavut
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILES BENNETT SCHUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2001