Schumilas, Harry Bret (CPSO#: 66478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Block Line Medical Clinic
1450 Block Line Rd.
Unit 201
Kitchener ON  N2C 0A5
Phone: (519) 578-4450
Fax: (519) 579-1142
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Bret Schumilas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oregon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRY BRET SCHUMILAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUMILAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999