Schurter, Melissa Lynne (CPSO#: 89378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers FHT
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 89378 )

Business Address:
Suite 12B
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA LYNNE SCHURTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHURTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010