Schuster, Martin (CPSO#: 62520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 George Street North
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone: (519) 740-6437
Fax: (519) 623-8642
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Schuster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schuster ( CPSO# 62520 )

Business Address:
50 George Street North
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone Number: (519) 740-6437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN SCHUSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1992