Schuurman, Joy Christina (CPSO#: 79320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joy Schuurman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schuurman ( CPSO# 79320 )

Business Address:
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
Suite 101
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOY CHRISTINA SCHUURMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUURMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004