Schwalm, Jon-David Reid (CPSO#: 77612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site DVBSRI
C3-108
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 577-1423
Fax: (905) 577-1474
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Schwalm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schwalm ( CPSO# 77612 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site C3-108
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 577-1423

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JON-DAVID REID SCHWALM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWALM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006