Schwartz, Elliott Michael (CPSO#: 26523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4640 Jane Street
Suite 104
Downsview ON  M3N 2K5
Phone: (416) 667-8900
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1680 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 658-6666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

21 Essa Road
Barrie Ontario
L4N 3K4
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-5433
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

11 Colborne Street East
Oshawa Ontario
L1G1M1
Oshawa ON  L1G1M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 728-5147
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Michael Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Schwartz ( CPSO# 26523 )

Business Address:
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
11 Colborne Street East
Oshawa ON  L1G 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 728-5147

Business Address:
Suite 104
4640 Jane Street
North York ON  M3N 2K5
Phone Number: (416) 667-8900

Business Address:
1680 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 658-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLIOTT MICHAEL SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974