Schwartz, Gwynne Ann (CPSO#: 51598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 897-1419
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gwynne Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Schwartz ( CPSO# 51598 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 897-1419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GWYNNE ANN SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985