Schwartz, Jacqueline Rachel (CPSO#: 88465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone: (416) 487-2052
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schwartz ( CPSO# 88465 )
Dr. M. Schwartz ( CPSO# 28259 )

Business Address:
745 Mount Pleasant Road
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2052

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE RACHEL SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010