Schwartz, Jesse Milo (CPSO#: 106874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jewish General Hospital
Department of Clinical Immunology
and Allergy
3755 Cote Ste Catherine Road
Montreal QC  M3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8222
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Louise Street
Winchester, Ontario
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: 613 724 2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury, Ontario
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE MILO SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2015