Schwartz, Kenneth Martin (CPSO#: 32895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3560 Bathurst. St.
Dept. of Psychiatry
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2882
Fax: (416) 785-2450
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth M. Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Schwartz ( CPSO# 32895 )

Business Address:
Baycrest
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
205 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2E8

Business Address:
1925 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2H 3M4

Business Address:
40 Playfair Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH MARTIN SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984