Schwartz, Thomas (CPSO#: 58794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
7005 Kildare Road
Cote St Luc QC  H4W 1C1
Phone: (514) 481-7167
Fax: (514) 489-5786

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1990