Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Schweigel, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 66992)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 2002