Schweiger, Franzjosef (CPSO#: 51599)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Schweiger, Franzjosef (used until: 31 May 1988 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999