Schweigert, Michael Karl (CPSO#: 68323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1600, 2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Phone: 416 549-1658
Fax: 416 549-1619
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KARL SCHWEIGERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWEIGERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999