Schweitzer, Kelly Donald (CPSO#: 86193)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Schweitzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock St. Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015