Schwerzmann, Markus (CPSO#: 80125)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Zurich, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Feb 2005