Sclater, Anne Louise (CPSO#: 55193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Phone: (519) 915-4339
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sclater Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sclater ( CPSO# 55193 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Suite 2405
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Amherstburg Family Health Team
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2M4
Phone Number: (519) 736-7770

Business Address:
Tilbury District Family Health Team
22 Mill Street West
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-9623

Business Address:
Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON  N8S 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 915-4339

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE SCLATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCLATER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1992