Scocchia, Tulio Gabriele (CPSO#: 58626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 406
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 525-0255
Fax: (905) 525-9764
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Scocchia and B. Elder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Elder ( CPSO# 52657 )
Dr. T. Scocchia ( CPSO# 58626 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 525-0255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TULIO GABRIELE SCOCCHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOCCHIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991