Scott, Alexander Victor Ferguson (CPSO#: 21306)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 27 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Mar 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Nov 2001
Summary:

 On November 19, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Scott(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he was found guilty of the criminal offence of 
 defrauding OHIP and engaged in inappropriate conduct.  The Committee reserved its decision on 
 penalty.

On March 27, 2002, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Scott 
 appear before the panel to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Registrar.

2.	Dr. Scott(s Certificate of Registration to be revoked by the Registrar effective 
 immediately.

3.	Costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 31, 2001