Scott, Andrea Dianne (CPSO#: 92204)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College, Cork, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011