Scott, Andrew Raymond (CPSO#: 78930)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Nottingham, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 23 Jun 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003