Scott, Anthony Frederick Christian (CPSO#: 19478)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996