Scott, Charles Fremont (CPSO#: 79597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: (613) 548-6042
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775


Corporation Name: Charles Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
X Ray Department
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  M5V 1N3

Business Address:
KMRI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES FREMONT SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008