Scott, Duncan Alexander (CPSO#: 51601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
669 Maple Road
Odessa ON  K0H 2H0
Phone: (613) 546-3116
Fax: (613) 767-7290
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Scott ( CPSO# 51601 )

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN ALEXANDER SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983