Scott, Francis Gordon Ellis (CPSO#: 19507)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 1540 St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B9
Instructions: Former patients should send medical records requests to Dr. Scott at the above noted address
Date Received: 13 Feb 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015