Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Scott, George Ducolon (CPSO#: 10972)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 08 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1939

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1940
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1994
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Aug 1995

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Aug 1995
Summary:

 On August 8, 1995, Dr. Scott pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 1 of the Medical Amendment Act, 1962-63, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a 
 professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner, or of incompetence.  Dr. 
 Scott also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the 
 Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect 
 or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner, or of incompetence.  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted Dr. Scott(s plea of guilty to these allegations, and found him guilty of professional 
 misconduct.  Other allegations were adjourned sine die.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that 
 Dr. Scott's name be erased forthwith from the Medical Register of the College of Physicians and 
 Surgeons of Ontario.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 08, 1995