Scott, Heather Mary (CPSO#: 59991)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 05 Sep 1998
Resident 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1999