Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Scott, Kane Alexander (CPSO#: 56963)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kane Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Feb 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013