Scott, Kellie Dawn (CPSO#: 79043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
204 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone: (519) 631-3223
Fax: (519) 286-0390
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kellie D. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Scott ( CPSO# 79043 )

Business Address:
3 - 204 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Phone Number: (519) 631-3223

Business Address:
15 Bonnie Place
St Thomas ON  N5R 5T8

Business Address:
350 Burwell Road
St Thomas ON  N5P 0A3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLIE DAWN SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005