Scott, Kirk John Irven (CPSO#: 29854)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Avenue Medical Centre 221 Brant Avenue Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017