Scott, Kristen Victoria (CPSO#: 98747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westminister Woods Medical Centre
33 Farley Drive, Unit 1
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone: 519-837-8137
Fax: 519-822-8240
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Scott ( CPSO# 98747 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone Number: (519) 763-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN VICTORIA SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014