Scott, Leslie Alanna (CPSO#: 51682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
of Western Ontario
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6C 2V1
Phone: (519) 685-8571
Fax: (519) 685-8241
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vinden ( CPSO# 55681 )
Dr. L. Scott ( CPSO# 51682 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Western Ontario
800 Commissioner Road East
London ON  N6C 2V1
Phone Number: (519) 685-8571


Corporation Name: C. M. Vinden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vinden ( CPSO# 55681 )
Dr. L. Scott ( CPSO# 51682 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V1
Phone Number: (519) 685-8407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 09 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ALANNA SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988