Scott, Lisa Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 81341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: MacNeil-Covin, Lisa Catherine Ann (used until: 14 Dec 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen St
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-6768
Fax: (866) 966-1940
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Scott ( CPSO# 81341 )

Business Address:
Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-6768

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA CATHERINE ANN SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006