Scott, Michael Andre Joseph (CPSO#: 59861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 346-8015
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. J. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Scott ( CPSO# 59861 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDRE JOSEPH SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989