Scott, Peter Alan (CPSO#: 18754)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jan 1985
Summary:

 In January 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Scott guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Scott(s licence was to be suspended for a period of 180 days.  This suspension 
 was itself to be suspended, subject to Dr. Scott(s compliance with the following 
 conditions:

(a)	Dr. Scott was to submit to an inspection of his practice of the kind contemplated 
 by s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, not limited to a single act or occurrence, but to all or 
 that part of his practice which the Registrar considered appropriate, to take place within six 
 months of the date upon which this Order became final.

(b)	If the Registrar was not satisfied 
 with the report following the inspection, a further inspection might take place not more than 
 eighteen months following receipt of the report covering the first inspection on the same terms 
 and conditions.

Upon compliance with the above conditions, the suspension of licence was to be 
 revoked.  In the event of Dr. Scott(s failure to comply with any of the above conditions, the said 
 suspension of licence was forthwith to come into force.

2.	Dr. Scott was to be reprimanded, with 
 the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also recommended that his 
 name be published.  In the event that Dr. Scott failed to appear at the time and place set by the 
 Registrar for his reprimand, his licence to practice was to be suspended until such time as he 
 appeared for his reprimand.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Jan 1985