Scott, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 60861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Kentucky Court
New Minas NS  B4N 4N2
Phone: (902) 678-5645
Fax: (902) 678-5649

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia


Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROBERT CHARLES SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990