Scott, Sheila Gordon (CPSO#: 32596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4712 Bowness Road Northwest
Calgary AB  T3B 0B4
Phone: (403) 247-1616

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA GORDON SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2005